9. Former name or former address, if changed since last report
N/A
10. Securities registered pursuant to Sections 8 and 12 of the SRC or Sections 4 and 8 of the RSA
Title of Each Class
Number of Shares of Common Stock Outstanding and Amount of Debt Outstanding
Common
250,000,001
11. Indicate the item numbers reported herein
N/A
The Exchange does not warrant and holds no responsibility for the veracity of the facts and representations contained in all corporate disclosures, including financial reports. All data contained herein are prepared and submitted by the disclosing party to the Exchange, and are disseminated solely for purposes of information. Any questions on the data contained herein should be addressed directly to the Corporate Information Officer of the disclosing party.
ACE Enexor, Inc.ACEX
PSE Disclosure Form 4-8 - Change in Directors and/or Officers (Resignation/Removal or Appointment/Election) References: SRC Rule 17 (SEC Form 17-C) and Section 4.4 of the Revised Disclosure Rules
Subject of the Disclosure
Resignation of director and President, Election of new director and President, and Appointment of officer
Background/Description of the Disclosure
Please be advised that the Board of Directors, at its meeting on 10 December 2021:
1. Accepted the resignation of Mr. Raymundo A. Reyes, Jr. ("Reyes") as director and President effective 1 January 2022
2. Elected Mr. Rolando J. Paulino, Jr. as director and President to replace Mr. Reyes effective 1 January 2022, and to serve the unexpired portion of the term of Mr. Reyes
Mr. Paulino has 27 years of international senior leadership experience in the energy sector and has worked in various sites in United Kingdom, Malaysia, Australia, and Philippines. He led large production and manufacturing facilities including those that supply more than 25% of energy of a country needs with passion, integrity, and care for people.
Mr. Paulino previously served as the Vice President for Philippines Upstream and Managing Director of Shell Philippines Exploration BV. He has also been part of various boards including Pilipinas Shell Petroleum Corporation, Tabangao Realty Inc., Philippine Energy Independence Council, Petroleum Association of the Philippines, Malampaya Foundation Inc and Pilipinas Shell Foundation Inc.
Mr. Paulino is currently the President of the Philippine Energy Independence Council and the President of the Petroleum Association of the Philippines. He is also a Fellow of the Institute of Corporate Directors, Fellow of ASEAN Academy for Engineering and Technology, a trained Executive Coach, a part-time Faculty at UST Graduate School and DLSU Mechanical Engineering.
3. Appointed Mr. Raymundo A. Reyes, Jr. as General Manager effective 1 January 2022.
Resignation/Removal or Replacement
Name of Person
Position/Designation
Effective Date of Resignation/Cessation of term (mmm/dd/yyyy)
Reason(s) for Resignation/Cessation
Raymundo A. Reyes, Jr.
Director and President
1/1/2022
Organizational restructuring
Election or Appointment
Name of Person
Position/Designation
Date of Appointment/Election (mmm/dd/yyyy)
Effective Date of Appointment Election (mmm/dd/yyyy)
Shareholdings in the Listed Company
Nature of Indirect Ownership
Direct
Indirect
Rolando J. Paulino, Jr.
Director and President
12/10/2021
1/1/2022
1
-
N/A
Raymundo A. Reyes, Jr.
General Manager
12/10/2021
1/1/2022
0
35,428
Lodged with PCD nominee
Promotion or Change in Designation
Name of Person
Position/Designation
Date of Approval (mmm/dd/yyyy)
Effective Date of Change (mmm/dd/yyyy)
Shareholdings in the Listed Company
Nature of Indirect Ownership
From
To
Direct
Indirect
-
-
-
-
-
-
-
-
Other Relevant Information
Amended to update shareholdings or Mr. Rolando J. Paulino.